CA SB714 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 281, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 120370, 120372, and 120372.05 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 714 Pan Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB714 Pan Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB714 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 281, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-09 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2019-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2673.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 18. Page 3100.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-09AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 3099.)
2019-09-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-07-09AssemblyJuly 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1179.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 849.) (April 24).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback