CA SB714 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 31190) of Division 21 of the Public Resources Code, relating to natural resources conservancy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State Coastal Conservancy: West Coyote Hills Conservancy Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB714 Newman et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4127.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2787.) |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1942.) (July 10). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Set for hearing July 10. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 1517.) (June 13). |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Set for hearing June 13. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 31190 | New Code | See Bill Text |