CA SB713 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11797 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 1210 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurer and State Compensation Insurance Fund investments.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB713 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 887.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 634.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 11797 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1210 | New Code | See Bill Text |