CA SB712 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 291, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 291, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11 (commencing with Section 54260) to Chapter 5 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: California tribes: federal fee-to-trust applications to regain ancestral lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB712 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 712 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Waldron (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB712 Hueso et al (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 712 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Waldron (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB712 Hueso et al (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 291, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2551.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2882.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | (Corrected July 9.) |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 1127.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | May 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 896.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54260 | New Code | See Bill Text |