CA SB71 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1209.5 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Infractions: community service: education programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB71 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 71 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB71 McGuire (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 71 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB71 McGuire (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2350.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 569.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 423.) (March 9). |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 9. |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1209.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |