CA SB71 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 41953 and 41956 of, to amend and renumber Sections 40059.2 and 40059.3 of, and to amend, renumber, add, and repeal Section 40059.1 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: disposal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Natural Resources] and [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB71 Wiener et al (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Natural Resources] and [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB71 Wiener et al (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | July 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and H. & C.D. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1313.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1177.) (May 25). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 1021.) (May 9). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 621.) (April 4). |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C., T. & H., and APPR. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25406 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25408 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 40059.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 41952 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 41953 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 41955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 41956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |