CA SB709 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - April 10 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 45600) to Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School employment: Sexual Abuse-Free Education (SAFE) Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateApril 10 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code45600New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback