CA SB707 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 20.5 (commencing with Section 42984) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Responsible Textile Recovery Act of 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Newman et al (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1401.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 895.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 572.) (March 29). |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42984 | New Code | See Bill Text |