CA SB707 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 870, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1280 and 1281.96 of, and to add Sections 1281.97, 1281.98, and 1281.99 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to arbitration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arbitration agreements: enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 707 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Wieckowski et al (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 870, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-13 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 18).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1331.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-20SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-09SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 800.) (April 23).
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-08SenateApril 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-08SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1280Amended CodeCitation Text
Code of Civil Procedure1281.96Amended CodeCitation Text
Code of Civil Procedure1281.97New CodeSee Bill Text
Code of Civil Procedure1281.98New CodeSee Bill Text
Code of Civil Procedure1281.99New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback