CA SB707 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 870, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 870, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1280 and 1281.96 of, and to add Sections 1281.97, 1281.98, and 1281.99 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to arbitration.
Title
Arbitration agreements: enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 707 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Wieckowski et al (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Wieckowski et al (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 870, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 18). |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1331.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 800.) (April 23). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | April 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.96 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.97 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.99 | New Code | See Bill Text |