CA SB707 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 14005.274 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal: Denti-Cal Advisory Group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 707 Cannella Senate Third Reading By MAYES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB707 Cannella et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB707 Cannella et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-26 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-04-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4112.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-22SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4056.) (January 18).
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-12SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 10.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14005.274Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback