CA SB703 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the heading of Chapter 3.7 (commencing with Section 7291) of, and to add and repeal Chapter 2.66 (commencing with Section 7286.27), Chapter 3.73 (commencing with Section 7292.2), and Chapter 3.74 (commencing with Section 7292.4) of, Part 1.7 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transactions and use taxes: Counties of Alameda and Santa Clara and City of Santa Fe Springs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB703 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 703 Skinner Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 703 Skinner Senate Third Reading By CALDERON Amendment Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB703 Skinner (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-12SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2791.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 3153.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 3001.)
2017-07-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-18AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-07-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 10).
2017-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-06-13AssemblyJune 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
2017-05-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-18SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1108.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1020.) (May 10).
2017-05-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-04-25SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2017-04-24SenateMay 3 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-19SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2017-04-13SenateApril 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback