CA SB701 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 29800 and 29805 of, and to repeal Section 29851 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: prohibited persons.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-05 - Assembly - 06/26/19 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-05 - Assembly - SB 701 Jones Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB701 Jones (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-05 - Assembly - SB 701 Jones Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB701 Jones (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-07-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-07-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2548.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1156.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 804.) (April 23). |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 29800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29851 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |