CA SB701 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 45 (commencing with Section 75500) to the Public Resources Code, relating to the Salton Sea, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Salton Sea Obligations Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB701 Hueso et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 27).
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 1328.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1020.) (May 10).
2017-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-04-27SenateMay 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-25SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2017-04-17SenateApril 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-10SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code75500New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback