CA SB700 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11 (commencing with Section 10440) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Sections 14005 and 14013 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment.
Title
State Contract Act: High Road Employment Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - SB 700 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Kalra Amend By REYES Set #1 (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB700 Durazo (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - SB 700 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Kalra Amend By REYES Set #1 (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB700 Durazo (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 19. Page 5398.) |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Kalra. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Chau. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and L. & E. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1110.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | May 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 14005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 14013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 10440 | New Code | See Bill Text |