CA SB700 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 379.6 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Self-generation incentive program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB700 Wiener Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 700 Wiener Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB700 Wiener (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 6023.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 6768.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 20).
2017-07-12AssemblyJuly 12 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1314.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 806.) (April 24).
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-06SenateApril 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2835New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code379.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback