CA SB700 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.21 (commencing with Section 5081) to Division 5 of, and to add Chapter 5.2 (commencing with Section 42280) to Part 3 of Division 30 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to natural resources.
Title
Natural resources: parks: carryout bags.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 789.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 467.) (April 9). |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5081 | New Code | See Bill Text |