CA SB70 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 48010 and 48011 of, and to add Section 48001 to, the Education Code, relating to kindergarten.
Title
Elementary education: kindergarten.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB70 Rubio et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 70 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Quirk-Silva (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB70 Rubio et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 70 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Quirk-Silva (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB70 Rubio et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-25 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 5225.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 5942.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 15). |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2820.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Rubio. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Rubio. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1182.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 668.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | March 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-12-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 8. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |