CA SB70 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 928, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 928, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11319 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to real estate.
Title
Real estate: Uniform Standards of Professional Appraisal Practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB70 Bates Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 70 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB70 Bates (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 70 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB70 Bates (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 928, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 5563.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6107.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 4069.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4043.) (January 16). |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3098.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 8. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 17 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 11319 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |