CA SB7 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 21178) of Division 13 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Environmental quality: Jobs and Economic Improvement Through Environmental Leadership Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Assembly - SB 7 Atkins Third Reading Urgency By RIVAS, R (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB7 Atkins et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB7 Atkins et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-05-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-05-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 1365.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 343.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 333.) (February 25). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing February 25. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 306.) (February 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Set for hearing February 22. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21178 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |