CA SB696 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 658, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 658, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10159.1, 10163.2, 10489.15, 10489.2, 10489.3, 10489.5, 10489.6, 10489.7, 10489.8, 10489.9, 10489.93, and 10489.94 of, to add Sections 10489.12, 10489.96, 10489.97, 10489.98, 10489.99, and 10489.992 to, and to repeal and add Sections 10489.1, 10489.4, and 10489.95 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: principle-based valuation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB696 Roth Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 696 Roth Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB696 Roth (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 696 Roth Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB696 Roth (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 658, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2670.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2962.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1210.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 820.) (April 28). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10159.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10163.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.93 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.94 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.96 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.97 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.99 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10489.992 | New Code | See Bill Text |