CA SB695 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 56026.3, 56028, 56043, and 56341.5 of, and to add Section 56348 to, the Education Code, relating to special education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special education: individualized education programs: translation services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB695 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 695 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB695 Portantino (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13 Veto sustained.
2020-01-13 Stricken from file.
2019-10-12 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-12 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-12SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 2885.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2873.)
2019-09-10SenateSet for hearing September 11.
2019-09-10SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2733.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-09-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 3197.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-11Assembly(Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2019-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1334.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-22SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1107.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 552.) (April 2).
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING and HUMAN S.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code56026.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56028Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56043Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56341.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56348New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback