CA SB693 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 51221.1 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: genocide education: the Holocaust.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB693 Stern et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-14AssemblyJuly 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-06-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1201.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 794.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 14.
2021-03-26SenateApril 7 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51221.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback