CA SB691 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 66251, 66260.6, and 66270 of, and to add Section 66270.3 to, the Education Code, relating to educational equity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational equity: immigration status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 691 Lara Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB691 Lara et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-29SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 6407.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 26).
2018-06-18AssemblyJune 19 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 4111.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2018-01-12SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4020.) (January 9).
2018-01-05SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-30SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-04-13SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66251Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66260.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66270Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66270.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code10050New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code10226Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13105Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13307Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code423.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback