CA SB691 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 66251, 66260.6, and 66270 of, and to add Section 66270.3 to, the Education Code, relating to educational equity.
Title
Educational equity: immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 691 Lara Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB691 Lara et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB691 Lara et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 6407.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | June 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 4111.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4020.) (January 9). |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66260.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66270.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 10050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 10226 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 423.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |