CA SB690 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 803.7 of the Penal Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB690 Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB690 Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1259.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1180.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 902.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | April 18 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 803.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |