CA SB690 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 31111.3 to the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal resources: Tijuana River Valley: funding prioritization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB690 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 690 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB690 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2019-08-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1281.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1107.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 24).
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code31111.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code13207Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code13229New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback