CA SB687 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 85090 to the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water Quality Control Plan: Delta Conveyance Project.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 937.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 658.) (April 11). |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 85090 | New Code | See Bill Text |