CA SB684 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 936, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 936, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.9 (commencing with Section 66044) to Chapter 2 of Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
California State University: doctoral programs in public health.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 684 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB684 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 684 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB684 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB684 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 684 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB684 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 936, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5381.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. | |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5931.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 72. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1346.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1200.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 588.) (March 23). |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66044 | New Code | See Bill Text |