CA SB683 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27540, 27875, 27880, 27920, 27925, 28160, 31620, and 31810 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 31500) of Division 10 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 31610) of Chapter 4 of Division 10 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, to amend the heading of Article 3 (commencing with Section 31700) of Chapter 4 of Division 10 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 26840, 31610, 31615, 31625, 31630, 31635, 31640, 31645, 31650, 31655, 31660, and 31700 of, and to add Sections 16535, 16865, and 26860 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Firearms: firearm safety certificate.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB683 Block Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 683 Block Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Order SB683 Block (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 683 Block Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Order SB683 Block (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2292.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 3026.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1150.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1018.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 568.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16670 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27875 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27925 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31620 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31625 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31630 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31635 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31640 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31645 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31650 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |