CA SB679 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 380, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 380, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4980.03, 4980.74, 4980.78, 4980.81, 4996.18, 4999.61, and 4999.62 of, to add Sections 4996.17.1 and 4996.17.2 to, to repeal Sections 4980.79, 4996.17, and 4999.63 of, and to repeal and add Sections 4980.72 and 4999.60 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts: therapists and counselors: licensing.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB679 Bates et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 679 Bates Senate Third Reading By Patterson (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB679 Bates et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 679 Bates Senate Third Reading By Patterson (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB679 Bates et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 380, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2530.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2959.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4980.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.79 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.17.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.17.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.63 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |