CA SB679 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - August 30 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 87406 of the Government Code, relating to the Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: postgovernment employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB679 Morrell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1262.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 744.) (April 18).
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-04-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11341Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code87406Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback