CA SB678 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 1228) of Title 8 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to probation.
Title
Criminal recidivism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB678 Leno Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-12 - Assembly - SB 678 Leno Senate Third Reading By HAGMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - SB 678 Leno Third Reading Urgency By HAGMAN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB678 Leno (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-12 - Assembly - SB 678 Leno Senate Third Reading By HAGMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - SB 678 Leno Third Reading Urgency By HAGMAN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB678 Leno (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-12 | In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2458.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-12 | In Assembly. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Read third time. Amended. (Page 3402.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3402.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-11 | In Senate. To unfinished business. Returned to Assembly for further action. | |
2009-09-11 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3336.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-10 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2009-09-09 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian. | |
2009-09-03 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-19 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-25 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |
2009-06-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-02 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 922.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 849.) | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 706.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |