CA SB677 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13085 to the Government Code, to amend Section 12556, 12558, 12619, 12723, 12724, and 12726 of, to add Sections 12599.5 and 12635.5 to, and to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 12559) to Part 2 of Division 11 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 15301 of the Vehicle Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Public safety: fireworks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2015-04-28 | Senate | April 28 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 796.) |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 726.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13085 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12556 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12558 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12599.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12619 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12635.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12723 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12724 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 15301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |