CA SB675 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4124 and 4124.5 of, and to add Sections 741.5, 4004.5, 4124.2, and 4771.6 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Prescribed grazing: local assistance grant program: Wildfire and Forest Resilience Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB675 Limón (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB675 Limón (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1365.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1179.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 658.) (April 11). |
2023-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4004.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4124.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4124.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4771.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 741.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |