CA SB675 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2637 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: monthly installment payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-23 - Assembly - SB 675 Ochoa Bogh Senate Third Reading By Mayes (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB675 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB675 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2021-10-06 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2476.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1392.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1045.) (May 6). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2637 | New Code | See Bill Text |