CA SB675 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10072 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Electronic benefits transfer system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB675 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB675 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 850.) (April 25). |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |