CA SB674 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12012.100 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tribal gaming: compact ratification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 674 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By Wood (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB674 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-03SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2962.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-19AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2019-08-19AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-08-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2019-06-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1160.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-14SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-14SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12012.100New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback