CA SB674 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 94157, 94158, 94159, 94160, 94161, 94163, 94164, and 94165 of the Education Code, relating to student loans, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Student Loan Refinancing Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 913.) (April 26). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and B. & F.I. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 94157 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94159 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94163 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94164 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |