CA SB673 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - January 15 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3098.)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 51934 and 51938 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive sexual health education and human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) prevention education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateJanuary 15 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3098.)
2019-12-20SenateSet for hearing January 15.
2019-04-22SenateApril 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-03-20SenateApril 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51934Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51938Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback