CA SB672 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65400, 65584.04, and 65585 of, and to add Section 65584.10 to, the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: regional housing need allocation: City of Brisbane.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB672 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-11Assembly(Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-06-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1155.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 22).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65400Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65584.04Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65584.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65585Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code98.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback