CA SB671 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 769, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 769, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13978.8 of, and to add Sections 14517 and 65072.5 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 2192 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: Clean Freight Corridor Efficiency Assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB671 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 671 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB671 Gonzalez et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 671 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB671 Gonzalez et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 769, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2356.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2611.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1200.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | May 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 917.) (April 26). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 781.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.Q. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13978.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14517 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65072.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2192 | Amended Code | Citation Text |