CA SB670 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 39611 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Air Resources Board: vehicle miles traveled: maps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2023-05-18SenateMay 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-08SenateMay 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 937.) (April 26).
2023-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2023-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2023-03-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-03-21SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2023-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39611New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback