CA SB670 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22440, 22441, 22441.1, 22442, 22442.1, 22442.2, 22442.3, 22442.4, 22442.5, 22442.6, 22443, 22443.1, 22443.3, 22444, 22445, 22446.5, 22447, and 22449 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 19.5 (commencing with Section 22440) of Division 8 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 8223 of the Government Code, relating to immigration form preparers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Form preparers: immigration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-31SenateDied on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2022-01-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-26SenateOrdered to second reading.
2022-01-26SenateRead third time and amended.
2022-01-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-18SenateOrdered to second reading.
2022-01-18SenateFrom inactive file on motion of Senator Caballero.
2021-06-02SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Caballero.
2021-06-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-28SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-05-28SenateRead third time and amended.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1200.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 937.) (April 27).
2021-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22440Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22441Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22441.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22442.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22443Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22443.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22443.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22444Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22445Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22446.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22447Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22449Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8223Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback