CA SB670 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 53122 to the Government Code, relating to telecommunications, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: community isolation outage: notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB670 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 670 McGuire Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB670 McGuire et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12Assembly(Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and G.O.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1215.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1107.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and G.O.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53122New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback