CA SB669 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.6 (commencing with Section 116765) and Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 116771) to, Part 12 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to water, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Water quality: Safe Drinking Water Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 772.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 652.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and G.O. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116765 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116771 | New Code | See Bill Text |