CA SB669 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 89036.5 to the Education Code, relating to personal services contracts.
Title
Personal services contracts: California State University.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | April 22 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89036.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |