CA SB668 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14991, 15042, 15056, 15071, 15071.5, 15075, 15091, and 15092 of, to add Sections 15071.1, 15071.3, 15071.4, and 15082 to, and to repeal Section 15081 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to commercial feed, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial feed: violations: administrative penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB668 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 668 McGuire Senate Third Reading By CABALLERO (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB668 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 6137.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 6197.)
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d) . (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6076.) Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-08-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6958.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-06-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-11AssemblyJune 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-06-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1224.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2017-04-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code14991Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code15042Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code15056Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code15071Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code15071.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code15071.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code15071.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code15071.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code15075Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code15081Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code15082New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code15091Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code15092Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15620Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24651Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback