CA SB665 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 5830) to, and to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 5832) to Part 3.2 of Division 5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Mental Health Services Fund: county jails.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB665 Umberg Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB665 Umberg Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2567.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2381.) (August 30). |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Set for hearing August 30. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | August 12 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-12 | Senate | Set for hearing August 12. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2079.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Set for hearing July 10. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Set for hearing June 26. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 19. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5830 | New Code | See Bill Text |