CA SB664 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 486, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 486, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25503.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: tied-house restrictions: advertising.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - SB664 Dodd et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 664 Dodd Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB664 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 664 Dodd Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB664 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 486, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2846.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to unfinished business. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Jackson. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2720.) |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2492.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2964.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | ">Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23056 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |